Written answers
Tuesday, 18 September 2018
Department of Agriculture, Food and the Marine
Ministerial Advisers Data
Alan Kelly (Tipperary, Labour)
Link to this: Individually | In context | Oireachtas source
587. To ask the Minister for Agriculture, Food and the Marine the political advisers being used by Ministers and Ministers of State in his Department since the commencement of this Government; the commencement dates of the employment of each; and the cessation dates of same employment in cases in which this applies. [36691/18]
Michael Creed (Cork North West, Fine Gael)
Link to this: Individually | In context | Oireachtas source
Under the Appointment of Special Adviser (Minister for Agriculture, Food and the Marine) Orders 2016 and 2018, the following special advisers have been appointed since I became Minister: Ms Áine Kilroy, Mr Jonathan Hoare and Mr Ultan Waldron.
Two advisers, Mr Hoare and Ms Kilroy, are currently serving, in line with Section 11 of the Public Service Management Act, 1997. The date of appointment of Ms Kilroy and Mr Hoare as stated in the Government Order is 14 June 2017. The order was signed on 19 September 2017. Their contracts terminate at the end of my term as Minister.
The date of appointment of Mr. Waldron as stated in the Government Order is 6th November 2017 and the order was signed on 23rd January 2018. Mr. Waldron was assigned as an adviser to cover a temporary absence and is no longer serving as an adviser.
No comments