Written answers
Wednesday, 12 January 2011
Department of Environment, Heritage and Local Government
State Boards
2:30 pm
Tommy Broughan (Dublin North East, Independent)
Link to this: Individually | In context
Question 793: To ask the Minister for the Environment, Heritage and Local Government the appointments he has made to State boards and State agencies under the remit of his Department since June 2007; and if he will make a statement on the matter. [1525/11]
John Gormley (Dublin South East, Green Party)
Link to this: Individually | In context
A number of different statutory processes are involved in appointments to State boards. In some cases statutory selection procedures must be followed or nominations must be sought from independent nominating panels before appointments are made by the Government or by the Minister for the Environment, Heritage and Local Government. In other cases only particular public office holders may be appointed to certain boards. In a number of situations, only some appointments to the body concerned are made by the Minister, or appointments are made with the consent of the Minister for Finance or following consultation with the Minister for Finance or Minister for Education and Skills, as appropriate.
In the context of the above, the following table sets out relevant information in respect of all persons appointed by me to the state boards under the aegis of my Department since June 2007. Some may have retired from these positions in the interim. The boards of An Bord Pleanála and the Environmental Protection Agency are executive in nature and the members are full-time salaried positions.
Housing and Sustainable Communities Ltd (HSC) was formed as a Private Single Member company subsidiary of the National Building Agency (NBA). It undertakes functions in relation to management of land arising as a result of the land aggregation scheme and leasing. The Board of "Housing and Sustainable Communities Ltd" will be paid a fee as part of their directorship of the NBA from 1 January 2011 (the board is the same for the NBA and members will be paid one fee).
The NBA is due to be wound down over the period of 2011 and a decision was taken to appoint a smaller streamlined Board to oversee this process with effect from 1 January 2011. This Board is also charged with overseeing the formal establishment of the Housing and Sustainable Communities Agency (HSCA). The functions of the Fire Services Council are being undertaken by the Department since the term of office of its members expired on 30 June 2009. It is not intended to reappoint a Council.
Name of State Body/Board | Names of Persons Appointed since July 2007 | |
Affordable Homes Partnership | Catherine GormanConn Murray* | The Minister appointed Board members in accordance with The Affordable Homes Partnership Establishment Order 2005. The lifetime of the AHP officially ended at 31 December 2010. |
An Bord Pleanála | Thomas O'Connor* | Appointed as ordinary member of An Bord Pleanála by the Minister under section 104 of the Planning and Development Act 2000. |
Margaret Byrne* | Appointed as ordinary member of An Bord Pleanála by the Minister under section 106 of the Planning and Development Act 2000. | |
Building Regulations Advisory Board | The Minister appoints the Building Regulations Advisory Body (BRAB), under Section 14 of the Building Control Act 1990. While there is no ex-officio category of membership, the practice has been to invite relevant organisations to nominate possible members. | |
Jay Stuart | Chair | |
Brian McKeon | Construction Industry Federation | |
Cian O'Lionáin* | Department of the Environment, Heritage and Local Government | |
Jack Callanan | National Disability Authority | |
Jimmy Keogan* | Dublin City Council | |
Mark McAuley | IBEC | |
Noel Carroll* | Department of the Environment, Heritage and Local Government | |
Sean Balfe* | National Standards Authority of Ireland | |
Jacqui Donnelly* | Department of the Environment, Heritage and Local Government | |
Sarah Neary* | Department of the Environment, Heritage and Local Government | |
Terry Prendergast | National Consumer Agency | |
Insp Maria Walsh* | An Garda Siochana | |
Edel Collins* | Office of Public Works | |
Kevin O'Rourke* | Sustainable Energy Association Ireland | |
An Chomhairle Leabharlanna | Senator Mark Dearey | An Chomhairle's members are appointed by the Minister for the Environment, Heritage and Local Government in accordance with the Local Government (An Chomhairle Leabharlanna) Regulations 1997-2007, all but three on the nomination of specified organisations, for a five-year term, as outlined below.The Chair of An Chomhairle is appointed by the Minister in consultation with the Minister for Education and Skills. |
Councillor Pat McMahon | Minister for Environment, Heritage and Local Government | |
Councillor Cora Long | Minister for Environment, Heritage and Local Government | |
Councillor Des Hurley | Association of County and City Councils | |
Councillor Michael Abbey | Local Authority Members Association | |
Councillor Jim Darcy | Association of Municipal Authorities of Ireland | |
Deirdre Ellis-King* | Library Association of Ireland | |
Ruth Flanagan* | Library Association of Ireland | |
Colette O'Flaherty* | National Library of Ireland | |
Robin Adams* | Board of Trinity College, Dublin | |
Jim Foran* | Higher Education Authority | |
Paul Sheehan* | Higher Education Authority | |
Gerardine Moloney* | Higher Education Authority | |
Councillor Billy Cameron* | Association of County and City Councils | |
Pat McMahon * | Library Association of Ireland | |
Fionnuala Hanrahan* | Library Association of Ireland | |
Comhar Sustainable Development Council | Persons are appointed by the Minister from nominations by bodies under each of the five pillars:State/public sector Economic sectorEnvironmental NGOs Social/community NGOs Professional/academic sector | |
Shirley Clerkin * | The Heritage Council | |
Tom O'Mahony * | Department of Environment, Heritage and Local Government | |
Jackie Maguire * | Office for Local Authority Management | |
Micheal O'Cinneide * | Environmental Protection Agency | |
Dr Clare Penny | Business in the Community Ireland | |
Emer Dunne | Irish Creamery Milk Suppliers Assoc. | |
Ruaidhrà Deasy | Irish Farmers Association | |
David Korowicz | Irish Environmental Network (Feasta) | |
Frank Corcoran * | Irish Environmental Network (An Taisce) | |
Pat Finnegan | Irish Environmental Network (GRIAN) | |
Jack O'Sullivan | Irish Environmental Network (An Taisce) | |
Fr Sean Healy | Social Justice Ireland | |
Niamh Garvey | D?chas | |
Elaine Nevin | National Youth Council of Ireland | |
Seamus Boland | Irish Rural Link | |
Sue Scott * | Royal Irish Academy | |
Deirdre McGrath * | Royal Town Planning Institute | |
Prof Vincent O'Flaherty * | Royal Irish Academy | |
Michael Layde * | Department of the Environment, Heritage and Local Government | |
Mary Stack * | Fáilte Ireland | |
Mairead Cirrillo | Small Firms Association | |
Finola McDonnell | Irish Business and Employers Confederation | |
Molly Walsh | Irish Environmental Network (Friends ofthe Earth) | |
Ann Irwin | Community Workers Co-op | |
Prof Ray Bates * | Royal Irish Academy | |
Ciaran Byrne * | Royal Dublin Society | |
Pat Farrell | Irish Farmers Association | |
Dr Matthew Crowe * | Environmental Protection Agency | |
John McCarthy* | Department of the Environment, Heritage and Local Government | |
Designated Areas Appeals Advisory Board | Ciana Campbell, appointed as Co-Chair | Appointed by the Minister for Environment, Heritage and Local Government |
Dublin Docklands Development Authority - Board | Gerry McCaugheyProf. Niamh Brennan*Mark Griffin*Yvonne FarrellDr Berna Grist* | Appointments to the DDDA are made by the Minister for the Environment, Heritage and Local Government under the DDDA Act 1997 |
Dublin Docklands Development Authority - Council | The DDDA Council is appointed under section 16 of the DDDA Act 1997 and nominated by the following: | |
Deaglain O' Brian* | Minister for Community Equality & Gaeltacht Affairs | |
Maurice Scully | Bord Gais Eireann | |
David Walsh* | Department of the Environment, Heritage and Local Government | |
Greg Clarke* | Dublin Chamber of Commerce | |
Niall Ring* | Dublin City Council | |
Claire O'Regan* | Dublin City Council | |
Ray McAdam* | Dublin City Council | |
Anne Graham* | National Transport Authority | |
Eamonn O'Reilly* | Dublin Port Company | |
Environmental Protection Agency ** | Larry Stapleton*Micheal O'Cinneide*Mary Kelly*Laura Burke*Dara Lynott*Matthew Crowe* | Appointed by the Government under section 24 of the Environmental Protection Agency Act 1992 |
Fire Services Council | Brendan Mahon* | Department of the Environment, Heritage and Local Government |
The Heritage Council | Conor Newman*Kealin IrelandDr Henry LyonsGráinne ShaffreyIan LumleyBrian Lucas*Helen O'Carroll*Professor Gabriel Cooney*Dr Brendan DunfordDr Caro-Lynn FerrisMary Keenan | Appointed by the Minister for the Environment, Heritage and Local Government in accordance with PART II 5. (5) the Schedule to the Heritage Act 1995 |
Housing Finance Agency | John Bolger*Philip Nugent* | Appointed by the Minister under the Housing Finance Agency Act 1981 |
Housing and Sustainable Communities Ltd*** | Rich HowlinGordon Richards*Eddie Lewis*John O'Connor*Marie McLaughlin*Peter Carey*John McCloskeyAnn McGuinness | Housing and Sustainable Communities Ltd was formed as a Private Single Member company subsidiary of the National Building Agency. This Board is the same Board appointed to the National Building Agency. |
Irish Water Safety | Laurence Kelly*Dave Corcoran* | Department of the Environment, Heritage and Local Government |
Limerick Northside Regeneration Agency | All nominations to the Boards of the Limerick Regeneration Agencies are made by way of Ministerial Order as set out in SI 275 and SI 276 of 2007 which established the Agencies. These were amended by the Local Government Services (Corporate Bodies) (Confirmation of Orders) Act 2008. The Orders and Act set out the membership of the Boards. | |
John Fitzgerald | Chairperson | |
Brendan Kenny* | CEO of the Agencies | |
John Laffan* | Department of Environment, Heritage and Local Government | |
Kathleen Stack* | Department of Community Equality & Gaeltacht Affairs | |
Michelle Shannon* | Department of Justice & Law Reform | |
Mary Moloney* | Department of Social Protection Representative | |
Tom Mackey* | Limerick City Manager | |
Alec Fleming* | Clare County Manage | |
Ned Gleeson* | Limerick County Manager | |
Willie Keane* | An Garda Siochána | |
Anne Cremin | Community Representative | |
Paddy Flannery | Community Representative | |
Michael Tiernan | Business Community Representative | |
Pat Fitzgerald* | HSE | |
Pat McSitric* | Department of Education and Skills | |
Eddie Lewis* | Department of the Environment, Heritage and Local Government | |
Nuala Kernan | Community Representative | |
Mary Donnelly* | FAS | |
Tom Coughlan* | Clare County Manager | |
Frank McGlynn* | Department of Social Protection | |
Thomas Mahon* | An Garda Siochána | |
Mary Tully* | Department of the Environment, Heritage and Local Government | |
David Sheahan* | An Garda Siochána | |
Michael Layde* | Department of the Environment, Heritage and Local Government | |
Limerick Southside Regeneration Agency | John Fitzgerald | Chairperson |
Brendan Kenny* | CEO of the Agencies | |
John Laffan* | Department of the Environment, Heritage and Local Government | |
Kathleen Stack* | Department of Community Equality & Gaeltacht Affairs | |
Michelle Shannon* | Department of Justice & Law Reform | |
Mary Moloney* | Department of Social Protection | |
Tom Mackey* | Limerick City Manager | |
Alec Fleming* | Clare County Manager | |
Ned Gleeson* | Limerick County Manager | |
Willie Keane* | An Garda Siochána | |
Fr. Pat Hogan | Community Representative | |
Ann Kavanagh | Community Representative | |
Liam McElligott | Business Community Representative | |
Pat Fitzgerald* | HSE | |
Pat McSitric* | Department of Education and Skills | |
Eddie Lewis* | Department of the Environment, Heritage and Local Government | |
Anne Bourke | Community Representative | |
Mary Donnelly | FAS | |
Tom Coughlan* | Clare County Manager | |
Frank McGlynn* | Department of Social Protection | |
Thomas Mahon* | An Garda Siochána | |
Mary Tully* | Department of the Environment, Heritage and Local Government | |
David Sheahan* | An Garda Siochána | |
Michael Layde* | Department of the Environment, Heritage and Local Government | |
Local Government Computer Services Board | Paul McDonald*Paul Lemass*Laurence Kelly*Barry Quinlan* | Department of the Environment, Heritage and Local Government |
Local Government Management Services Board | Martha Doyle*Paul Lemass*Paul McDonald*Joe Allen*Barry Quinlan* | Department of the Environment, Heritage and Local Government |
National Building Agency **** | John McCarthy*Eddie Lewis*John O'Connor*Marie McLaughlin*Peter Carey*Rich HowlinGordon Richards*John McCloskeyAnn McGuinness | Appointments to the Board of the NBA are made in accordance with Article 70 of the Articles of Association of the National Building Agency Limited, whereby the Minister consults with the Minister for Finance on the appointment of Directors. Article 69 provides that the number of Directors should be not less than three nor more than thirteen. |
National Traveller Accommodation Consultative Committee | Jim Ganley* | Department of the Environment, Heritage and Local Government |
John Paul Collins | Pavee Point | |
Private Residential Tenancies Board (PRTB) | Orla CoyneLiam Gleeson*Aideen HaydenCiaran McNamara*Dr. Eoin O Sullivan*Thomas J ReillyCian O Lionain*Dessie LarkinAidan Brennan*Finian MatthewsJohn TiernanJoan O'Dowd*Vincent P. MartinGene Feighery | Appointed under Section 153 of the Residential Tenancies Act 2004, which provides that the Minister shall appoint people with experience in a field of expertise relevant to the Board's functions. |
Joe Meehan*Conn Murray* | ||
Radiological Protection Institute of Ireland (RPII) | James FitzmauriceNuala AhernDarina MuckianJohn O'DeaAdi Roche | Nominated by the Minister under Section 3(a) of the First Schedule of the Radiological Protection Act, 1991 |
Dr Maurice Fitzgerald | Nominated by the Dental Council under Section 3(b) of the First Schedule of the Radiological Protection Act, 1991 | |
Dr Kevin Kelleher* | Nominated by the HSE under Section 3(b) of the First Schedule of the Radiological Protection Act, 1991 | |
Dr Ãamann Breatnach | Nominated by the Medical Council under Section 3(b) of the First Schedule of the Radiological Protection Act, 1991 | |
Dr Patrick Gilligan | Nominated by the Association of Physical Sciences in Medicine under Section 3(b) of the First Schedule of the Radiological Protection Act, 1991 | |
Fionnuala Barker | Nominated by the Irish Nuclear Medicine Association under Section 3(b) of the First Schedule of the Radiological Protection Act, 1991 | |
Dr Stephanie Ryan | Nominated by the Faculty of Radiologists, Royal College of Surgeons of Ireland under Section 3(b) of the First Schedule of the Radiological Protection Act, 1991 | |
The Rent Tribunal | Moya QuinlanMary DoyleLouise MoloneyMorette KinsellaKieran BuckleyWilliam StanbridgeFred DevlinOrla CoyneDr Eoin O'Sullivan*Tom O'ReillyMary Heaslip | Rent Tribunal members are appointed under the Housing (Private Rented Dwellings) (Amendment) Act, 1983. |
*Civil/Public Servant
No comments