Written answers
Wednesday, 5 May 2010
Department of Arts, Sport and Tourism
Ministerial Appointments
9:00 pm
Fergus O'Dowd (Louth, Fine Gael)
Link to this: Individually | In context
Question 271: To ask the Minister for Tourism, Culture and Sport the details of any former Government office holder appointed by her in the past ten years to any position; the details of such appointment to include position taken, name of organisation, salary or income derived or expenses claimed per annum, any other additional benefits including car provided, travel costs per annum, terms of office and so on; and if she will make a statement on the matter. [17705/10]
Mary Hanafin (Dún Laoghaire, Fianna Fail)
Link to this: Individually | In context
Since the establishment of this Department formerly the Department of Arts, Sport and Tourism in mid 2002 the following former Government office holders have been appointed by Ministers to the following bodies under the aegis of the Department:
Name of appointee | Position | Term of Office |
Mr Peter Barry | Board member of the National Museum of Ireland | 5 years from 3 May 2005. Mr Barry resigned on 18th October 2007 |
Mr Gerard Collins | Board member of the National Museum of Ireland | 5 years from 3 May 2005 |
Mr David Byrne | Chairman of the board of the National Concert Hall | 5 years from 1 June 2006 |
The bodies in question are category 4 bodies and the relevant fees are as follows:
Date | Chairman | Member |
June 2002 to end December 2005 | â'¬7,618 | â'¬5,079 |
1 January 2006 to 30 April 2009 | â'¬10,500 | â'¬7,000 |
1 May 2009 to 31 December 2009 | â'¬9,450 | â'¬6,300 |
1 January 2010 to date | â'¬8,978 | â'¬5,985 |
No additional benefits apply. The payment of expenses to chairpersons and members of boards is a day to day matter for each body in line with Department of Finance guidelines.
No comments