Written answers
Wednesday, 6 July 2016
Department of Health
Appointments to State Boards
Catherine Martin (Dublin Rathdown, Green Party)
Link to this: Individually | In context | Oireachtas source
231. To ask the Minister for Health the number of appointments he has made to State boards since the move to the Public Appointments Service two years ago to date; the names of those appointed and the relevant position on each board; the names of those persons on the shortlist; the date when the shortlist was provided to him; and if he will make a statement on the matter. [20068/16]
Simon Harris (Wicklow, Fine Gael)
Link to this: Individually | In context | Oireachtas source
The nomination and appointment process for boards of bodies under the aegis of my Department is set out in legislation. In line with Government Decision S180/20/10/1617 of 2014 and Guidelines set out by the Department of Public Expenditure and Reform relating to the advertising for expressions of interest in vacancies on State Boards, my Department in conjunction with the Public Appointments Service (PAS) currently advertises for board vacancies as they arise, where I, as Minister for Health, have nominating rights under relevant legislation. Appointments through this process commenced in early 2015.
The following table shows the number of appointments that have been made by the Minister for Health, where the Minister has nominating rights and where the positions were advertised through PAS. The date on which the PAS shortlist was given to my Department, rather than the date on which I or previous Ministers for Health received the names of candidates whose names came through the PAS process has been provided in the table.
Board | Name | Position | Date Shortlist provided by PAS to DoH | Date Appointed |
---|---|---|---|---|
Leopardstown Park Hospital | Denis Duff | Ordinary Member | 23/12/2014 | 16/2/2015 |
Leopardstown Park Hospital | Dermot Magan | Ordinary Member | 23/12/2014 | 16/2/2015 |
Leopardstown Park Hospital | Francis Ni Fhlannchadha | Ordinary Member | 23/12/2014 | 16/2/2015 |
St James Hospital | Paul Donnelly | Chairperson | 04/2/2015 | 17/6/2015 |
Health Information and Quality Authority | Martin Sisk | Ordinary Member | 13/5/2015 | 29/7/2015 |
Health Information and Quality Authority | Molly Burkley | Ordinary Member | 13/5/2015 | 29/7/2015 |
Health Information and Quality Authority | Dr Paula Kilbane | Ordinary Member | 13/5/2015 | 29/7/2015 |
Health Information and Quality Authority | Stephen O'Flaherty | Ordinary Member | 13/5/2015 | 29/7/2015 |
Childrens Hospital Group Board | John Caulfield | Ordinary Member | 26/6/2015 | 16/9/2015 |
Irish Blood Transfusion Service | Prof Anthony Staines | Chairperson | 15/5/2015 | 14/7/2015 |
Irish Blood Transfusion Service | Deirdre Cullivan | Ordinary Member | 15/5/2015 | 20/7/2015 |
Irish Blood Transfusion Service | John Malone | Ordinary Member | 15/5/2015 | 20/7/2015 |
Irish Blood Transfusion Service | Dr Ronan Desmond | Ordinary Member | 15/5/2015 | 20/7/2015 |
Irish Blood Transfusion Service | Simon Mills | Ordinary Member | 15/5/2015 | 20/7/2015 |
Irish Blood Transfusion Service | Yvonne Traynor | Ordinary Member | 15/5/2015 | 20/7/2015 |
Pharmaceutical Society of Ireland | Ann Sheehan | Ordinary Member | 04/6/2015 | 17/6/2015 |
Pharmaceutical Society of Ireland | Fintan Foy | Ordinary Member | 04/6/2015 | 17/6/2015 |
Pharmaceutical Society of Ireland | Graham Knowles | Ordinary Member | 04/6/2015 | 17/6/2015 |
Pharmaceutical Society of Ireland | Paul Turpin | Ordinary Member | 04/6/2015 | 17/6/2015 |
Health Research Board | Bernadette Hannigan | Ordinary Member | 31/8/2015 | 5/11/2015 |
Health Research Board | Charles Normand | Ordinary Member | 31/8/2015 | 5/11/2015 |
Health Research Board | Jane Grimson | Ordinary Member | 31/8/2015 | 5/11/2015 |
Nursing and Midwifery Board of Ireland | Martin Higgins | Ordinary Member | 21/9/2015 | 29/10/2015 |
Medical Council | Thomas J O'Higgins | Ordinary Member | 5/10/2015 | 28/10/2015 |
Dental Council | Eleanor O'Higgins | Ordinary Member | 12/11/2015 | 12/1/2016 |
Dental Council | Gerry Cleary | Ordinary Member | 12/11/2015 | 13/11/2015 |
Dental Council | James Doorley | Ordinary Member | 12/11/2015 | 12/1/2016 |
Dental Council | Muireann O'Neill | Ordinary Member | 12/11/2015 | 12/1/2016 |
Health Products Regulatory Authority | David Holohan | Ordinary Member | 10/11/2015 | 27/1/2016 |
Health Products Regulatory Authority | Brian Jones | Ordinary Member | 10/11/2015 | 27/1/2016 |
Food Safety Authority of Ireland | Martin Higgins | Ordinary Member | 11/1/2016 | 15/6/2016 |
Food Safety Authority of Ireland | Ros O'Shea | Ordinary Member | 11/1/2016 | 15/6/2016 |
Food Safety Authority of Ireland | Mary Cullen | Ordinary Member | 11/1/2016 | 15/6/2016 |
Food Safety Authority of Ireland | Derek Cunningham | Ordinary Member | 11/1/2016 | 15/6/2016 |
Health Insurance Authority | Fiona Kiernan | Ordinary Member | 4/12/2015 | 1/2/2016 |
Health Insurance Authority | James McNamara | Ordinary Member | 4/12/2015 | 1/2/2016 |
Health Insurance Authority | Sean Coyle | Ordinary Member | 4/12/2015 | 1/2/2016 |
Health Insurance Authority | Ian Britchfield | Ordinary Member | 4/12/2015 | 20/6/2016 |
I have not provided the names on the PAS shortlists to the Deputy. This information is covered by personal confidentiality and I also believe that the public interest would not be served by disclosing the names. Persons who may wish to be considered for board membership may be reluctant to come forward into the PAS process if their names were subject to disclosure in circumstances where they were not actually appointed.
No comments